Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Task Force on Preventing and Countering Domestic Terrorism
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Preventing and Countering Domestic Terrorism to consider optimal policies and practices for preventing and countering domestic terrorism; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations based on the role of the State, the level of resources needed, public transparency, and online extremism; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0864
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1164 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Task Force on Preventing and Countering Domestic Terrorism
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:26 PM
Click to return on the top page