Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Recordation and Filing - Proof of Occupational or Professional License or Admission to Bar
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Department of Assessments and Taxation from accepting for recordation or filing certain documents unless the entity requesting the recordation or filing has provided the Department certain proof that the owner of the entity, or a member, a partner, a shareholder, or an authorized agent of the entity, holds a certain occupational or professional license or is admitted to the Bar of the Court of Appeals of Maryland; and applying the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0971
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Recordation and Filing - Proof of Occupational or Professional License or Admission to Bar
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page