Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsored by
Delegates Attar, Fraser-Hidalgo, Cardin, Lehman, Lierman, Smith, Barve, Boyce, Bridges, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Gilchrist, Harrison, Healey, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, Lafferty, Love, Otto, Stein, Stewart, Wells, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that motor scooter sharing companies include on each motor scooter or electric low speed scooter made available to the public an embossed tactile phone number through which an individual who is blind or visually impaired may contact the company; requiring that motor or electric scooter sharing companies provide individuals with disabilities certain nonvisual access to their websites and mobile applications that is consistent with certain federal standards; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0805
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {290219/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {717079/1
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {717079/1
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {290219/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {717079/1 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {717079/1 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-134.5, 18.7-101, 18.7-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page