Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Barron, Brooks, Dumais, Haynes, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Korman, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Queen, Rosenberg, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System to determine whether to create an independent school board for the Juvenile Services Education System and identify ways to reform and improve juvenile education services; requiring the Workgroup to convene on or before September 1, 2018; requiring the Workgroup to submit a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly in a certain format by December 20, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0657
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text - First - Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page