Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Acevero, Charles, Pena-Melnyk, Corderman, W. Fisher, Harrison, Hettleman, Ivey, Jackson, Johnson, Kelly, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, McKay, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Queen, Solomon, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Turner, C. Watson, Wilkins, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Hill, Kerr, Pendergrass, Sample-Hughes, K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that a diaper-changing facility be installed in certain public restrooms in certain public buildings; requiring the Board of Public Works, through the Department of General Services, to adopt certain standards; providing that the Department of General Services, the University System of Maryland, and the Department of Transportation are responsible for the enforcement of certain provisions of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0330
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396883/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-14)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {518074/1
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Committee Amendment {518074/1
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {518074/1
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {396883/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (124-14) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {518074/1 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Committee Amendment {518074/1 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Ready) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {518074/1 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Ready) Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-801 through 2-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page