Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase Ho. Co. 10-22
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Howard County to grant, by law, a property tax credit, equal to 100% of any rate increase that exceeds $1.014 for each $100 of assessment, against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling if the dwelling is owned by an individual who is at least 65 years old, has resided in the dwelling for 30 consecutive years, and whose combined income does not exceed $75,000; and authorizing the governing body of Howard County to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the credit.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Howard County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase Ho. Co. 10-22
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Howard County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase Ho. Co. 10-22
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase Ho. Co. 10-22
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 2:02 PM
Click to return on the top page