Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Volunteer Company Member
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson (By Request)
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the method of computing the average weekly wage for workers' compensation benefits for specified members of a volunteer ambulance, ambulance and rescue, or fire company in Baltimore County; and providing that the average weekly wage for workers' compensation benefits for specified members of volunteer companies shall be the greater of the salary or wages from other employment of the covered employee or the equivalent of the base salary of a specified professional firefighter or emergency medical technician.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page