Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Class D License – Transfer
Sponsored by
Delegate Patterson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring in Charles County that the transferee of a certain alcoholic beverages license have on an annual basis a certain percentage of on-premises sales; and providing that the Board of License Commissioners may revoke or deny renewal of a certain license, under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0884
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Class D License – Transfer
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   18-102, 18-1705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page