Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Hornberger
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the powers and duties of the State Board of Master Electricians; changing the name of the Board to the State Board of Electricians; requiring the General Assembly by December 1, 2024, to consider legislation proposed by the Workgroup to Study Limited Energy Services necessary for the regulation and licensing of low-voltage electricians if certain legislation establishing a certain licensing program is not enacted by July 1, 2024; establishing the Workgroup to Study Limited Energy Services; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0762
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613095/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-24)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {613095/1 Adopted 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (108-24) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Referred Rules 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 4/8/2021 6:34 PM
Click to return on the top page