Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Water Commerce Account - Contracts for the Purchase of Environmental Outcomes
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in entering into a certain contract under the Clean Water Commerce Account for the purchase of an environmental outcome, to allow for nonuniform payment schedules for certain purposes; and authorizing the Department to require a certain payment or certain financial protections for contracts of a certain size to ensure certain outcomes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1144
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933728/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-31)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-10)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Clean Water Commerce Account - Contracts for the Purchase of Environmental Outcomes
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {933728/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Clean Water Commerce Account - Contracts for the Purchase of Environmental Outcomes
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (109-31) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-10) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 9:11 AM
Click to return on the top page