Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill and Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the Maryland Uniform Disclaimer of Property Interests Act to provide for the disclaimer of nonprobate transfers at death; providing for the creation, revocation, recordation, and effects of a transfer-on-death deed for real property; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to develop an informational sheet regarding transfer-on-death deeds for use at courthouses and on the website for the Maryland courts; providing example forms for the creation and revocation of a transfer-on-death deed; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0853
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Reassigned to Judiciary 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
(   16.5-101 through 16.5-601, 9-209,   9-212   )
Last Updated: 4/6/2022 12:00 PM
Click to return on the top page