Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Patient-Centered Opioid Addiction Treatment Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Bromwell, Kipke, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before January 1, 2018, specified opioid treatment programs to meet specified requirements; requiring an opioid treatment program to establish specified treatment protocols; requiring an opioid treatment program to provide a copy of the protocols to the Office of Health Care Quality before being licensed by the Behavioral Health Administration; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Patient-Centered Opioid Addiction Treatment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Patient-Centered Opioid Addiction Treatment Act
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
(   8-101, 8-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page