Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration - Historic Motor Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate McMillan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 20 to 25 years the age that a motor vehicle must attain to be eligible for registration as a historic motor vehicle; requiring an applicant for registration of a historic motor vehicle to submit a certification that the vehicle is insured by a specified vehicle insurance policy; prohibiting an individual from registering a motor vehicle as a historic motor vehicle unless the individual owns a specified other vehicle that is used as the individual's primary method of transportation; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-936 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page