Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pilot Program to Evaluate Alternative Registration Plates and Cards
Sponsored by
Delegate Mautz
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to conduct a pilot program to evaluate the use of alternative vehicle registration plates and cards for certain vehicles; and requiring the Administration to report on the results of the pilot program to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2027.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Pilot Program to Evaluate Alternative Registration Plates and Cards
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {443721/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Pilot Program to Evaluate Alternative Registration Plates and Cards
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (122-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-619.4 )
Last Updated: 4/3/2022 1:42 PM
Click to return on the top page