Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsored by
Delegate Corderman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Washington County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $70,000,000 in order to finance the costs of the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in Washington County, as herein defined, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0889
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page