Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses - Samples and Sales of Product
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Tarlau, Barkley, and B. Barnes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing a limit on the number of samples of a specified product a holder of a Class 1 distillery license may serve to a specified individual under specified circumstances; authorizing the holder of a Class 1 distillery license to provide samples in an amount not exceeding a specified amount of a single product to a specified individual; and altering from three 750-milliliter bottles to 9 liters of products the amount of specified products a holder of a Class 1 distillery license may sell for off-premises consumption; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses - Samples and Sales of Product
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page