Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegate Swain
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to meet at least once per month and hold at least two meetings at which the public is invited to testify; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0722
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page