Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Property and Casualty Insurance Guaranty Corporation - Covered Claims
Sponsored by
Delegate Frick
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "covered claim" for purposes of the Property and Casualty Insurance Guaranty Corporation to include claims resulting from an injury or damage that took place before the earlier of specified dates; altering a specified exclusion from covered claims; and applying the Act retroactively.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0697
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Property and Casualty Insurance Guaranty Corporation - Covered Claims
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   9-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page