Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund to be the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund; altering the purpose of the Fund to include making grants to certain health centers and hospitals and certain providers to increase access to prenatal care; requiring the Governor to include appropriations in the annual budget bill for the Fund; altering the proposals that are required to receive priority to include those from areas with high rates of infants with low birthweight; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0777
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health – Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {316586/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health – Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-31)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Health – Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {316586/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health – Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (102-31) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page