Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a campaign finance entity to initiate the transfer of a contribution made through a third-party payment processor from the account of the third-party payment processor to the designated campaign account of the campaign finance entity within 7 days after the contribution is deposited in the account of the third-party payment processor; repealing the authority of campaign finance entity to pay certain expenses from funds other than a campaign account; authorizing the State Board to impose certain civil penalties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1380 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021, July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {345960/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-20)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor - Transfer to Campaign Account
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {345960/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (113-20) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page