Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - University System of Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Approving certain projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of certain academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; approving the issuance of bonds by the University System of Maryland in a certain total principal amount for financing the projects; and providing that the bonds issued under the authority of the Act are not a debt or obligation of the State or any of its subdivisions.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Text - Chapter - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page