Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes – Public Monuments – Destruction of Property
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Boteler, M. Fisher, Hornberger, Krebs, McComas, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from willfully destroying, mutilating, defacing, injuring, or removing certain monuments under certain circumstances; requiring a court to order restitution for certain costs; authorizing prosecution of certain offenses by a certain State's Attorney or the Attorney General; prohibiting payment of certain State money to a county or municipality under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes – Public Monuments – Destruction of Property
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Crimes – Public Monuments – Destruction of Property
House 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   6-301.1 )
Last Updated: 3/4/2022 4:49 PM
Click to return on the top page