Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Roads Commission - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Process on Behalf of the Department of Transportation
Sponsored by
Delegate Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to authorize the General Assembly to enact a law authorizing the taking of certain property for critical infrastructure projects by the State Roads Commission on behalf of the Department of Transportation; authorizing property to be condemned for certain projects; prohibiting property from being condemned for pedestrian paths or trails; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Roads Commission - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Process on Behalf of the Department of Transportation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   12-101 )
(   1-101, 2-112, 2-801, 2-802 through 2-806, 2-807, 2-808, 2-809, 2-810, 2-811 through 2-815, 2-818, 2-819, 2-820, 2-821, 2-822, 2-823, 8-302, 8-318 through 8-331, 8-334 through 8-339 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page