Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Exemptions - Employees Receiving Social Security Disability Insurance Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Maryland Wage and Hour Law does not apply to specified employees who receive federal Social Security disability insurance benefits.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/28/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page