Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Special Police - Legal Business Prohibition PG 308-19
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of a person that exists and functions for a legal business in Prince George's County to apply for the appointment of special police officers to protect business property; and prohibiting the renewal of a commission of a special police officer employed by a legal business in Prince George's County to protect business property.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prince George's County - Special Police - Legal Business Prohibition PG 308-19
House 3/13/2019 3/14/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-303, 3-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page