Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Limitation on Introduction of Bills
Sponsored by
Delegate Folden
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a member of the Senate from introducing more than 15 bills and a member of the House of Delegates from introducing more than 10 bills during a regular or special legislative session; and providing that the Act does not apply to bills introduced on behalf of specified persons or bills prefiled under a specified provision of law.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
(   2-1502.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page