Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Industry 4.0 Technology Grant Program (Maryland Manufacturing Innovation Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Industry 4.0 Technology Grant Program in the Department of Commerce to provide grants to small and medium-sized manufacturing enterprises to assist those manufacturers with implementing new Industry 4.0 technology or related infrastructure for certain purposes; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 to the Program for fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter; and creating the Maryland Manufacturing 4.0 Initiative Governance Committee.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {813628/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development - Industry 4.0 Technology Grant Program (Maryland Manufacturing Innovation Act of 2022)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {813628/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Industry 4.0 Technology Grant Program (Maryland Manufacturing Innovation Act of 2022)
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (120-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-1901 through 5-1903 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 9:58 PM
Click to return on the top page