Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Substance Use Disorder Treatment and Recovery Levels of Care - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Howard, Arentz, Buckel, Griffith, Hinebaugh, Hornberger, McComas, Miller, Mireku-North, T. Morgan, Munoz, Taylor, Tomlinson, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Chisholm, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to conduct a certain study on linkages between levels of care within the substance use disorder treatment and recovery continuum of care; and requiring the Department to report the results of the study and make recommendations on improvements to existing discharge and linkage requirements to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2024.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1198 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Drug and Alcohol Treatment Programs - Discharge of Patients and Referral Services - Standards
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments {483126/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Substance Use Disorder Treatment and Recovery Levels of Care - Study
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Finance 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7.5-402.1 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:28 PM
Click to return on the top page