Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Taxes - Baltimore City Residential Retention Credit - Termination of Sunset
Sponsored by
Delegates Attar, Amprey, Boyce, C. Branch, Bridges, Clippinger, Conaway, R. Lewis, Lierman, McIntosh, Prettyman, Rosenberg, Smith, and Wells
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Terminating the sunset of a certain property tax credit against the property tax imposed on a certain dwelling in Baltimore City that is newly purchased by a homeowner who has received the homestead property tax credit for a dwelling in Baltimore City.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Property Taxes - Baltimore City Residential Retention Credit - Termination of Sunset
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Taxes - Baltimore City Residential Retention Credit - Termination of Sunset
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Text - Chapter - Property Taxes - Baltimore City Residential Retention Credit - Termination of Sunset
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page