Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners – Sexual Abuse – Reporting and Statute of Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Jones, Shetty, Carr, Foley, Hill, Patterson, Proctor, and Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the statute of limitations for prosecuting a certain sexual offense if the offense is committed by a health care practitioner; and requiring health care practitioners who suspect or have reason to believe that a patient is being sexually abused to notify certain individuals or the head of certain hospitals or related institutions or the designee of certain hospitals or related institutions in a certain manner and within a certain time frame.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners – Sexual Abuse – Reporting and Statute of Limitations
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/30/2022 11:35 AM
Click to return on the top page