Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender - Entry Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegate Carter
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a specified restriction against a registered sex offender entering specified real property does not apply if the registrant's ward is a student or receives child care under specified circumstances or the registrant enters the property for the purpose of attending or participating in worship or other activity sponsored by a house of worship under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0635
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page