Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Sexual Assault Examination Kits - Best Practices Study
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Glass, Parrott, Valentino-Smith, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of State Police, the Forensic Laboratory Advisory Committee, and the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to collaborate on research to improve the State's collection, testing, and storage of sexual assault examination kits, as well as victim notification procedures; requiring the research to include specified issues, to identify specified improvements, to outline a specified plan, and to recommend specified regulations; requiring a report to be submitted to the General Assembly by December 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Sexual Assault Examination Kits - Best Practices Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Sexual Assault Examination Kits - Best Practices Study
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page