Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of Use
Sponsored by
Delegates Sanchez and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the prohibition against keeping a dwelling, a building, a vehicle, a vessel, an aircraft, or any other place resorted to by individuals for the purpose of administering illegally controlled dangerous substances to remove the prohibition from provisions relating to common nuisance; and altering a specified penalty.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of Use
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of Use
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (76-64)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of Use
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of Use
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (76-64) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-601, 5-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page