Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historic Ellicott City Workgroup on Preservation and Flooding
Sponsored by
Delegates Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Healey, McMillan, Otto, Robinson, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Historic Ellicott City Workgroup on Preservation and Flooding to study and design a process for determining instances in which the benefits provided to the historic preservation of the Ellicott City Historic District by adherence to a certain standard are outweighed by the benefits provided by the adoption of a certain set of measures that allows for a certain exception to the historic preservation standard; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {420417/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Historic Ellicott City Workgroup on Preservation and Flooding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Local Jurisdictions – Historic Preservation Standards – Prevention of Lethal and Life–Threatening Nontidal Flooding
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {420417/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Historic Ellicott City Workgroup on Preservation and Flooding
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-103, 1-401, 8-101, 8-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page