Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Saab
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, a certain health practitioner to issue a prescription electronically; authorizing an authorized prescriber to issue a written or oral prescription only under certain circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Health, in collaboration with the Maryland Health Care Commission, to adopt certain regulations regarding a certain waiver that includes certain provisions; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Requirements
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page