Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; establishing that the purpose of the Program is to provide a means of authorizing individuals in a food service facility to obtain and store auto-injectable epinephrine and administer auto-injectable epinephrine to individuals who are experiencing anaphylaxis when physician or emergency medical services are not immediately available; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0898
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-7A-01 through 13-7A-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page