Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Charles County to allow a person to obtain a direct or indirect interest in, in addition to certain other licenses, not more than a certain number of Class B-H (hotel), Class B-R (restaurant), or Class B-RB (restaurant/bar) on-sale beer, wine, and liquor licenses.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0965
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2022 3/24/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 3/24/2022 9:53 AM
Click to return on the top page