Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition to make recommendations regarding how the State may adjust its economic development and other strategies in the context of changes resulting from crises in certain sectors; and requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2022, and a final report on or before December 1, 2023, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0782
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/6/2022 8:09 PM
Click to return on the top page