Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Military Retirement (Tax Relief for Military Retirees Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Howard, Munoz, and Rogers
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering for certain taxable years a certain limitation on a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain military retirement income; providing the subtraction for the tax year beginning after December 31, 2021, but before January 1, 2023, is the greater of $15,000 or 50% of the amount of military retirement income received during that taxable year; and providing that for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022, all military retirement income received can be subtracted.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0361 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Military Retirement (Tax Relief for Military Retirees Act of 2022)
Last Updated: 2/22/2022 9:02 PM
Click to return on the top page