Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Registration Plates - Return
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Folden, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, and Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that registration plates that are required to be returned to the Motor Vehicle Administration may be returned through the mail.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {110613/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration - Registration Plates - Return
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Administration - Registration Plates - Return
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Administration - Registration Plates - Return and Expiration
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {110613/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration - Registration Plates - Return
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Administration - Registration Plates - Return
(   11-101, 11-131, 13-410 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page