Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Beitzel, Buckel, Hornberger, McKay, Otto, Reilly, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Department of the Environment to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; specifying the purpose for which the Fund may be used; requiring that a specified owner of a natural gas or oil interest make a specified demonstration in order to receive compensation from the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0980
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   14-107.1, 14-107.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page