Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Make Office Vacancies Extinct Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher and Barkley
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Make Office Vacancies Extinct Program in the Department of Commerce; providing that the purposes of the Program is to encourage the location of new businesses in the State in counties with a support program to reduce office space vacancies; establishing qualifications for participation in the Program; authorizing the Program to provide for specified grants to specified businesses on a first-come, first-served basis, subject to a specified limitation; establishing a Make Office Vacancies Extinct Matching Fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Make Office Vacancies Extinct Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753596/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Make Office Vacancies Extinct Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-11)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Make Office Vacancies Extinct Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Make Office Vacancies Extinct Program
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {753596/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Make Office Vacancies Extinct Program
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (125-11) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846
Text - Chapter - Make Office Vacancies Extinct Program
(   5-102, 5-1501 through 5-1507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page