Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maggie McIntosh School Arts Fund - Established
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maggie McIntosh School Arts Fund to provide grants to public schools in Baltimore City to purchase art supplies for classrooms and to expand the arts curriculum for students in public schools in Baltimore City; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; and altering the allocation of revenues from the State Lottery Fund after June 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - School Arts Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {133527/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maggie McIntosh School Arts Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493020/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maggie McIntosh School Arts Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maggie McIntosh School Arts Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2022 2/26/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - School Arts Fund - Established
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/12/2022 3/12/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243925/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Floor Amendment {133527/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maggie McIntosh School Arts Fund - Established
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {493020/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maggie McIntosh School Arts Fund - Established
Post Passage 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Text - Chapter - Maggie McIntosh School Arts Fund - Established
(   5-243 )
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 8:27 AM
Click to return on the top page