Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Conaway, Hayes, Haynes, R. Lewis, McCray, Oaks, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs to be the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; renaming the Special Secretary for the Office of Minority Affairs to be the Special Secretary for the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; renaming the Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs to be the Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0700
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Text - Chapter - State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
(   11-1001 )
(   9-1605.2, 9-1605.3, 9-345, 9-421 )
(   20-303, 24-310 )
(   12-105, 12-110, 14-302, 14-303, 14-305, 14-308, 14-503, 14-505, 6-222 )
(   9-1A-10, 9-1A-23, 9-1A-36, 9-20C-02, 9-301 through 9-303.1, 9-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page