Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors
Sponsored by
Delegate Kramer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 794
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Securities Commissioner of the Division of Securities of the Office of the Attorney General to bring a civil action for damages against a certain person that violates certain provisions of law on behalf of a certain person; authorizing the Commissioner to recover certain damages; authorizing the Commissioner to recover certain costs under certain circumstances; providing that a certain criminal conviction is not a prerequisite for maintenance of an action under the Act; and applying the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-6)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 794
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-6) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 794
Text - Chapter - Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors
(   8-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page