Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegates McDermott and Conway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Worcester County Board of License Commissioners to issue a specified alcoholic beverages license within the corporate limits of the Town of Berlin, the corporate limits of the Town of Snow Hill, or the corporate limits of the City of Pocomoke.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page