Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County - Walker Mill Daycare and Training Center
Sponsored by
Delegates Griffith, Braveboy, and Davis
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to extend the deadline for the Board of Directors of Walker Mill Development, Inc. to present evidence that a matching fund will be provided; providing that the grant may not terminate before June 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1000
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Prior authorizations that were altered during the 2013 Session were amended into the Omnibus Bill (HB 1372). Individual prior authorizations were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 1372 to alter prior authorizations.
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Griffith) Adopted (127-2)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Griffith) Adopted (127-2) 44
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 44
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations
(   2010, 2012 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page