Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expressing the intent of the General Assembly for Prince George's County to study whether a higher education financial assistance program should be offered in the county; requiring Prince George's County, on or before December 1, 2018, to perform specified actions related to a study of a student loan refinancing program in Prince George's County, including reviewing the Prince George's County Supplemental Higher Educational Loan Authority and performing a specified feasibility and demand study; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page