Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Hettleman, Tarlau, Lierman, Queen, Valentino-Smith, Jones, Sydnor, Lisanti, A. Miller, Korman, K. Young, Krimm, Morhaim, and Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program to pilot a management model where a juvenile services education program at a facility located in a county is operated by the county board of education; requiring the Program to begin in the 2019-2020 school year; requiring the State Department of Education to identify one juvenile services education program to participate in the Program; requiring a certain workgroup to make recommendations on the management and operation of juvenile services education programs; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {855962/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514039/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Text - First - Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {855962/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {514039/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Text - Chapter - Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
(   22-308, 6-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page