Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian - Adverse Immigration Action
Sponsored by
Delegate Sanchez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making certain provisions relating to the appointment or designation of a standby guardian of the person or property of a minor in cases of incapacity, debilitation, or death of a parent applicable to the appointment or designation of a standby guardian of the person or property of a minor in the event of an adverse immigration action being initiated against a parent; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1239
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {312316/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian – Removal From the United States
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {312316/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian - Adverse Immigration Action
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-901, 13-902, 13-903, 13-904, 13-907 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page